FL S0676 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Designating the "Florida High-Speed Passenger Rail Safety Act"; requiring the Department of Transportation to regulate railroad companies when that authority is not federally preempted; providing that certain railroad companies are responsible for ensuring that impacted roadbeds meet specified transition requirements under certain circumstances; requiring the department's railroad inspectors, in accordance with a specified program, to meet certain certification requirements and to coordinate their activities with those of federal inspectors in this state in compliance with certain federal regulations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High-speed Passenger Rail Safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-27SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-01-23SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2020-01-22SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-21SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-01-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/21/20, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-06SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-10-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H465 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
341601Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341603Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341608Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341609Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3416101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341611Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback