FL S0674 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Chapter No. 2024-267
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring governmental entities to include a requirement in certain contracts that certain iron or steel products be produced in the United States; authorizing the minimal use of foreign steel and iron materials in certain circumstances; exempting specified products from the requirement, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

United States-produced Iron and Steel in Public Works Projects

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#903 (Y: 103 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-27 Chapter No. 2024-267
2024-06-26 Approved by Governor
2024-06-17 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2024-03-06SenateOrdered enrolled
2024-03-06HousePassed; YEAS 103, NAYS 9
2024-03-06HouseRead 3rd time
2024-03-05HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2024-03-05HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2024-03-05HouseRead 2nd time
2024-03-04House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2024-03-04HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
2024-03-04HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2024-02-14HouseIn Messages
2024-02-14SenateImmediately certified
2024-02-14SenatePassed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1
2024-02-14SenateRead 3rd time
2024-02-14SenateRead 2nd time
2024-02-08SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/24
2024-02-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2024-01-31SenateFavorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2024-01-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/31/24, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2024-01-17SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2024-01-16SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2024-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/16/24, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2024-01-09SenateIntroduced
2023-12-13SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Fiscal Policy
2023-12-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H779 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2550993Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/674
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/674/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/674/BillText/er/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/674/Analyses/2024s00674.pre.go.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/674/Analyses/2024s00674.go.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/674/Analyses/2024s00674.pre.fp.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/674/Analyses/2024s00674.fp.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/674/Vote/2024-01-16%201100AM~S00674%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/674/Vote/2024-01-31%200900AM~S00674%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/674/Vote/SenateVote_s00674__013.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/674/Vote/HouseVote_s00674__903.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback