FL S0670 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that a cause of action for negligence or violation of residents' rights alleging direct or vicarious liability for the injury or death of a nursing home resident may be brought against a licensee, its management or consulting company, its managing employees, and any direct caregiver employees or contractors; providing that a claim for punitive damages may not be brought unless there is a showing of evidence that provides a reasonable basis for recovery of such damages when certain criteria are applied; authorizing the Agency for Health Care Administration to revoke the license or deny a license renewal or change of ownership application of a nursing home facility that fails to pay a judgment or settlement agreement; revising procedures for obtaining the records of a resident, etc.
Title
Nursing Home Litigation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#646 (Y: 109 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Chapter No. 2014-83 | |
2014-06-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | CS passed; YEAS 109 NAYS 7 |
2014-04-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-22 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 569 |
2014-04-18 | House | Received |
2014-04-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/14 |
2014-04-18 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2014-04-11 | House | In Messages |
2014-04-03 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 3 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/26/14 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-03-20 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | CS/CS by- Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/18/14, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Judiciary |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Rules |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/18/14, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2014-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/11/14, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0569 (Similar To) 2014-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 670 (Ch. 2014-83)
H0831 (Similar To) 2014-02-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 670 (Ch. 2014-83)
S1042 (Similar To) 2014-02-28 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 670 (Ch. 2014-83)
H0831 (Similar To) 2014-02-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 670 (Ch. 2014-83)
S1042 (Similar To) 2014-02-28 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 670 (Ch. 2014-83)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0237 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |