FL S0668 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a district school board to create a year-round school program for any school within its district that is one of the 300 lowest-performing schools in the state; authorizing a specified number of hours in a summer program or a year-round school program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Year-round School Programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Education
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-08SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations
2017-10-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H587 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101162Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback