FL S0666 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a specified reduction for a civil penalty under certain circumstances; requiring a person to pay the clerk of the court the specified percentage previously deducted under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Noncriminal Traffic Infractions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-09SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-08SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/08/18, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-05SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2017-12-05SenateFavorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 1
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 12/05/17, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-11-08SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-10-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H531 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
H7087 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-118
S620 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7087

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31815Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback