FL S0666 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a written residential rental agreement to include a statement specifying whether insurance coverage is required; providing a form for such statement; providing notice requirements; limiting the scope to written rental agreements; prohibiting a cause of action relating to a landlord's failure to enforce an insurance requirement, etc.
Title
Residential Tenant Insurance Policies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0651 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/666 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0666/BillText/Filed/HTML |