FL S0664 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring salvors of pleasure vessels to provide specified written notice to a customer who is present on a pleasure vessel before engaging in a salvage operation of the vessel, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Salvage of Pleasure Vessels

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied on Calendar
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-26SenateCS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2018-02-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-23SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-22SenateCS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/22/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-30SenateCS/CS by Transportation read 1st time
2018-01-29SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-26SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-25SenateCS/CS by Transportation; YEAS 5 NAYS 2
2018-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/25/18, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-12SenateNow in Transportation
2017-12-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-12-04SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 7 NAYS 1
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 12/04/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-11-08SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Transportation; Rules
2017-10-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H469 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
559952Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599601Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599603Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599608Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback