FL S0660 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 783
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 783
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Designating chapter 714, F.S., as the Uniform Commercial Real Estate Receivership Act; specifying that a court has exclusive jurisdiction to direct receivers and determine controversies under certain circumstances; providing requirements and authorizations relating to the appointment of a receiver; providing for defenses and immunities of a receiver; authorizing the court to enter certain orders if the court concludes that receivership property is likely to be insufficient to satisfy certain claims; requiring a receiver to file a final report containing certain information upon completion of the receiver's duties, etc.
Title
Uniform Commercial Real Estate Receivership Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 783 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 783 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-06 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/04/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 12/10/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H783 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-106
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
714 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
714 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |