FL S0660 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Revising criteria under which a nonprofit religious organization that facilitates the sharing of contributions among its participants for financial, physical, or medical needs is exempt from requirements of the code, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Insurance Code Exemption for Nonprofit Religious Organizations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#863 (Y: 89 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21 Chapter No. 2018-25
2018-03-19 Approved by Governor
2018-03-12 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-07SenateOrdered enrolled 882
2018-03-07HousePassed; YEAS 89 NAYS 27
2018-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-06HouseSubstituted for CS/CS/HB 1021
2018-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-05HouseReceived
2018-03-05HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18
2018-03-05HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-02-27HouseIn Messages
2018-02-21SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-02-21SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-08SenateOrdered engrossed
2018-02-08SenateAmendment(s) adopted (394130)
2018-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/08/18
2018-01-25SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-25SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/25/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-18SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-18SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/18/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-10SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-01-10SenateFavorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/10/18, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-12-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered
2017-11-08SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
2017-10-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1021 (Same As) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 660

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6241265Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback