FL S0658 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing counties imposing the tax to use the tax revenues, under certain circumstances, for specified purposes and costs relating to public facilities, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tourist Development Tax

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-07SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-05SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-01-31SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 02/05/18, 4:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-05SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
2017-12-05SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2017-11-08SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2017-10-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H585 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
H7087 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-118

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1250104Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback