FL S0654 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Florida Caregiving Youth Task Force within the Department of Health for a specified purpose; providing for membership, meetings, and duties of the task force; defining the terms "caregiving youth" and "household member"; requiring the Department of Education to establish a training program for school personnel related to caregiving youth for a specified purpose, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Caregiving Youth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-05SenateDied in Health Policy
2023-03-07SenateIntroduced
2023-02-16SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy
2023-02-09SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1006045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100925Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012581Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback