FL S0654 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Board of Trustees of Santa Fe College to establish a transportation access fee for students enrolled at Sante Fe College, including students enrolled in workforce education programs. Requires that revenue from the fee be used only to provide or improve access to transportation services. Requires that a referendum be held by the student government to approve the application of the fee. Prohibits the inclusion of the fee in calculating the amount a student receives under the Florida Bright Futures Scholarship Program awards, etc.
Title
Student Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-11 | Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on Higher Education Appropriations; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 204 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 54 | |
2011-02-23 | Now in Budget -SJ 117 | |
2011-02-22 | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 5 NAYS 1 -SJ 117 | |
2011-02-21 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/22/11, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-02-17 | Now in Transportation -SJ 118 | |
2011-02-10 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-02-08 | CS by Higher Education; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 118 | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to Transportation; Higher Education; Budget -SJ 54 | |
2011-01-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0007 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1009 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |