FL S0648 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 549
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a licensed dentist to complete a minimum of 2 hours of continuing education on the prescribing of controlled substances biennially, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continuing Education for Dentists

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 549
2019-04-23SenateSubstituted HB 549
2019-04-23SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-03SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-03-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/03/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-19SenateNow in Rules
2019-03-19SenateFavorable by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-03-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 03/19/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateNow in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-02-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/04/19, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Health Policy; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
2019-02-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H549 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Ordered enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4660135Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback