FL S0646 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Chapter No. 2020-28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Chapter No. 2020-28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing certain intercollegiate athletes to earn compensation for the use of their names, images, or likenesses; prohibiting a postsecondary educational institution and other entities, institutions, and their employees from compensating intercollegiate athletes or prospective intercollegiate athletes for the use of their names, images, or likenesses; prohibiting the revocation or reduction of certain aid as a result of intercollegiate athletes earning certain compensation or obtaining specified representation; providing requirements for certain athlete agents, etc.
Title
Intercollegiate Athlete Compensation and Rights
Sponsors
Senate Innovation, Industry, and Technology Committee | Senate Education Committee | Sen. Debbie Mayfield [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#763 (Y: 98 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#735 (Y: 101 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#735 (Y: 101 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-12 | Chapter No. 2020-28 | |
2020-06-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-11 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-13 | House | CS passed; YEAS 98 NAYS 14 |
2020-03-13 | House | Receded from 1 amendment(s) (370715) 1225 |
2020-03-12 | House | In returning messages |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Requested House to recede |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Refused to concur in 1 amendment(s) (370715) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | In returning messages |
2020-03-11 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 101 NAYS 14 |
2020-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-11 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (370715) 1045 |
2020-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20 |
2020-03-09 | House | Received |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-03-09 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 2 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-19 | Senate | CS/CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | CS/CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 02/17/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-12 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Now in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Referred to Education; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H287 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee
H251 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee
S582 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
H7051 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 646 passed
H251 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee
S582 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
H7051 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 646 passed
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1006 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 453 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |