FL S0646 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 13 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing certain intercollegiate athletes to earn compensation for the use of their names, images, or likenesses; prohibiting a postsecondary educational institution and other entities, institutions, and their employees from compensating intercollegiate athletes or prospective intercollegiate athletes for the use of their names, images, or likenesses; prohibiting the revocation or reduction of certain aid as a result of intercollegiate athletes earning certain compensation or obtaining specified representation; providing requirements for certain athlete agents, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Intercollegiate Athlete Compensation and Rights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#763 (Y: 98 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#735 (Y: 101 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13SenateOrdered enrolled
2020-03-13HouseCS passed; YEAS 98 NAYS 14
2020-03-13HouseReceded from 1 amendment(s) (370715) 1225
2020-03-12HouseIn returning messages
2020-03-12SenateRequested House to recede
2020-03-12SenateRefused to concur in 1 amendment(s) (370715)
2020-03-12SenateIn returning messages
2020-03-11HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 101 NAYS 14
2020-03-11HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-11HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2020-03-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10HouseAmendment(s) adopted (370715) 1045
2020-03-10HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-03-09HouseReceived
2020-03-09HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-09HouseIn Messages
2020-03-09SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 2
2020-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-06SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-26SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-02-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-19SenateCS/CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time
2020-02-19SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-18SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-17SenateCS/CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 02/17/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-12SenateCS by Education read 1st time
2020-02-12SenateNow in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
2020-02-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-10SenateCS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-06SenateReferred to Education; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
2019-10-24SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H287 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee
H251 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee
S582 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
H7051 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 646 passed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100674Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468453Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback