FL S0644 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the establishment of civil citation or similar diversion programs for juveniles; specifying program eligibility, participation, and implementation requirements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Civil Citation and Similar Diversion Programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-12SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2017-12-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-12-04SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 2
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 12/04/17, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-11-08SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-10-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H489 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S1392 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-127

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
943051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98512Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback