FL S0638 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Chapter No. 2022-94
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Chapter No. 2022-94
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Extending the expiration date of the Early Childhood Music Education Incentive Pilot Program, etc.
Title
Early Childhood Music Education Incentive Pilot Program
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#725 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Chapter No. 2022-94 | |
2022-05-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-05-03 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-03 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-03 | House | Substituted for HB 277 |
2022-02-28 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | In Messages |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/03/22 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/20/22, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2021-11-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 11/30/21, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H277 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 638