FL S0636 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles or its authorized agents to collect electronic mail addresses and use electronic mail for certain purposes; limiting the applications the department may accept by electronic or telephonic means; requiring that all electronic mail addresses be mutually shared between the department and its authorized agents upon request; authorizing the department, instead of the Fish and Wildlife Conservation Commission, to accept certain applications by electronic or telephonic means, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-14SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-13SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-02-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/13/20, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-27SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-01-23SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2020-01-22SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-21SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-01-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/21/20, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-06SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-10-23SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H435 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
H1007 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31940Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32830Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32840Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32880Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback