FL S0634 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as "Jordan's Law"; requiring the Florida Court Educational Council to establish certain standards for instruction of circuit and county court judges for dependency cases; requiring the Department of Law Enforcement to provide certain information to law enforcement officers relating to specified individuals; requiring that the guardian ad litem training program include training on the recognition of and responses to head trauma and brain injury in children younger than a specified age, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Welfare

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-18SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/16/19, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-03SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2019-04-03SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-04-02SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-01SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-03-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/01/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-01-31SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H315 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390143Amended CodeSee Bill Text
398296Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409906Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409988Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409996Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94317297Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback