FL S0634 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Eliminating certain requirements for residential treatment centers that provide services to commercially sexually exploited children, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential Treatment Center Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-23SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2018-02-21SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2018-02-21SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-20SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-02-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/20/18, 11:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-08SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-10-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H487 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
394495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4091678Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback