FL S0628 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Deleting a specified timeframe in which certain information must be provided to a pregnant woman before a termination of pregnancy may be performed; deleting provisions prohibiting state agencies, local governmental entities, and Medicaid managed care plans from expending funds for the benefit of, paying funds to, or initiating or renewing contracts with certain organizations that perform abortions; deleting a requirement that the Agency for Health Care Administration inspect a specified percentage of abortion clinic patient records as a component of license inspections, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion Clinic Regulations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2021-11-03SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2021-10-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6023 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
S1642 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3900111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390012Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback