FL S0628 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the Boards of Medicine and Osteopathic Medicine, respectively, the Department of Health, certain health care facilities, and insurers from requiring physicians and osteopathic physicians to maintain certification or obtain recertification as a condition of licensure, reimbursement, or admitting privileges, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maintenance of Certification or Recertification

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Health Policy
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-08SenateReferred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2017-10-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H81 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
H1047 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4583113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4590056Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback