FL S0626 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting provisions specifying that a person has no duty to retreat and has the right to stand his or her ground and meet force with force in certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Use of Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H4019 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H4027 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S1100 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice
H0879 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H4027 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S1100 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice
H0879 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
776 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
776 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
776 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
776 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/626 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0626/BillText/Filed/HTML |