FL S0624 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a retiree of the Florida Retirement System to be reemployed under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Reemployment After Retirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/624 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/624/BillText/Filed/HTML |