FL S0624 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Redefining the term "critical infrastructure facility"; authorizing the use of a drone if a law enforcement agency possesses reasonable suspicion that, under particular circumstances, swift action is needed to facilitate the collection of evidence at a crime scene or traffic crash scene; authorizing the use of a drone by a local or state agency when used in the assessment of damage, flood state, wildfire, or land management, or the monitoring and collection of scientific or marketing data, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drones

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Rules
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-07SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-06SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/06/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-02-01SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-01-31SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-01-30SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-29SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-01-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/29/18, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-02SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2017-10-24SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H471 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93450Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback