FL S0620 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7087
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying that certain filing fees for trial and appellate proceedings must be deposited into the State Courts Revenue Trust Fund rather than the General Revenue Fund; providing a documentary stamp tax exemption for notes and mortgages that are given in connection with a loan made by or on behalf of a housing financing authority; revising the military operations that qualify certain servicemembers for an additional ad valorem tax exemption; deleting a condition for unremarried spouses of deceased disabled ex-servicemembers to claim a certain ad valorem tax exemption; providing exemptions from documentary stamp taxes for certain loans made by the Florida Small Business Emergency Bridge Loan Program and the Agricultural Economic Development Program; revising the calculation of certain taxes by the Department of Revenue; reducing the tax levied on rental or license fees charged for the use of real property; increasing, for a specified fiscal year, the total amount of tax credits for the rehabilitation of drycleaning-solvent-contaminated sites and brownfield sites in designated brownfield areas, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7087
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted CS/HB 7087
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time 939
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-03-05SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time 719
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-05SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-03-02SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-18SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-01-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 01/16/18, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-17SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
2017-11-14SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-11-13SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-11-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 11/13/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-11-02SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2017-10-24SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H531 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
H607 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
H647 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
H819 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
H939 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
H7087 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-118
S60 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
S312 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
S666 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
S672 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S730 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
S926 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
S1386 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
S1608 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
159621Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1930237Amended CodeSee Bill Text
193155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1934516Amended CodeSee Bill Text
193461Amended CodeSee Bill Text
196173Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19624Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1973631Amended CodeSee Bill Text
197572Amended CodeSee Bill Text
197573Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
206052Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2069826Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2069952Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2069955Amended CodeSee Bill Text
206996Amended CodeSee Bill Text
210205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
212031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
212055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
212205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
218135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220183Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2201845Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37630781Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6245105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
74101Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback