FL S0618 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on October 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 581
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing an investigative or law enforcement officer conducting an investigation into specified matters to subpoena certain persons or entities for the production of records, documents, or other tangible things and testimony; authorizing a subpoenaed person to petition a court for an order modifying or setting aside the subpoena or a prohibition on disclosure; authorizing a court to punish a person who does not comply with a subpoena as indirect criminal contempt, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Subpoenas in Investigations of Sexual Offenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 581
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted CS/HB 581
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-02-15SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-15SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
2018-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-23SenateCS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-01-22SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-19SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-18SenateCS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
2018-01-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/18/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-12SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-01-12SenateRemaining references corrected to Judiciary; Rules
2018-01-12SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Appropriations
2018-01-11SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-01-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-09SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/09/18, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-11-02SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations; Rules
2017-10-24SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H581 (Same As) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-93
S1256 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
934255Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback