FL S0606 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 21 (Ch. 2023-317)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing honorary designations of certain transportation facilities in a specified county; directing the Department of Transportation to erect suitable markers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Facility Designations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-05SenateDied in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 21 (Ch. 2023-317)
2023-03-07SenateIntroduced
2023-02-16SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy
2023-02-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H893 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 21 (Ch. 2023-317)
S96 (Similar To) 2023-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 21 (Ch. 2023-317)
H21 (Similar To) 2023-07-07 - Chapter No. 2023-317

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback