FL S0606 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adding 911 public safety telecommunicators to the class; requiring such members to have their retirement benefits calculated in accordance with provisions applicable to Regular Class members; specifying the required employer retirement contribution rates for the new membership subclass of 911 public safety telecommunicators, etc.
Title
Special Risk Class of the Florida Retirement System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H379 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
121 | 0515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/606 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/606/BillText/Filed/HTML |