FL S0604 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that a contractor who fails to carry required insurance may be personally liable for damages that would have been covered by such insurance, etc.
Title
Actions against Contractors without Required Insurance Coverage
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Steube [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-10-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H89 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/604 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/604/BillText/Filed/HTML |