FL S0602 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a court to depart from mandatory minimum terms of imprisonment for certain drug trafficking offenses if it makes specified findings, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mandatory Minimum Sentences

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-07SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-06SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/06/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-12SenateNow in Judiciary
2017-12-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-12-04SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 1
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 12/04/17, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-11-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/13/17, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2017-11-02SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations; Rules
2017-10-23SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H481 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S694 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S1218 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
893135Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback