FL S0600 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 591 (Ch. 2019-38)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Exempting from public records requirements customer meter-derived data and billing information in increments of less than one billing cycle which is held by certain utilities; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Meter-derived Data and Billing Information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 591 (Ch. 2019-38)
2019-05-01SenateSubstituted CS/HB 591
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/19
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-10SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-04-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/10/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-02SenateNow in Rules
2019-04-02SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/02/19, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-13SenateCS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time
2019-03-08SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2019-03-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-06SenateCS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 03/06/19, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-01-29SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H591 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-38

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11907Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1190713Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback