FL S0600 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the criteria for renewal of Florida Bright Futures Scholarship Program awards to include a minimum number of volunteer service work hours; providing an exception for a student who enlists in military service, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Bright Futures Scholarship Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Education
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-02SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; Appropriations
2017-10-23SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1009532Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback