FL S0594 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Attorney General, at the request of one or more members of the Legislature, to investigate whether a certain official action of the governing body of a county or municipality violated state law or the State Constitution; requiring the Attorney General to report his or her findings and conclusions to the Governor, the Legislature, and the Secretary of State; providing requirements if no violation is found, etc.
Title
State Shared Revenues
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/594 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/594/BillText/Filed/HTML |