FL S0594 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the "Senator Helen Gordon Davis Fair Pay Protection Act"; prohibiting an employer from providing less favorable employment opportunities to employees based on their sex; prohibiting an employer from taking certain employment actions against employees; prohibiting an employer from engaging in certain activities relating to employee wages and benefits or requiring employees to sign certain waivers and documents, etc.
Title
Discrimination in Labor and Employment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-10-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H393 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
448 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
448 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
448 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/594 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/594/BillText/Filed/HTML |