FL S0592 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a law enforcement officer or traffic enforcement officer who issues a traffic citation during a traffic stop to record certain information on the citation; defining the term "racial profiling"; prohibiting a law enforcement officer from engaging in racial profiling in the performance of official duties, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law Enforcement Practices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-02SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2017-10-23SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H397 (Same As) 2018-01-16 - On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/18/18, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316614Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316651Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9431714Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback