FL S0590 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1435
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Children and Families, in collaboration with sheriffs' offices that conduct child protective investigations and community-based care lead agencies, to develop a statewide family-finding program; requiring the court to request that parents consent to providing access to additional records; providing the purpose of a kinship navigator program; revising enrollment and attendance requirements for children in an early education or child care program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Welfare

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1435
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 1435
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time 843
2018-03-06SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2018-03-05SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2018-03-02SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar for 03/05/2018
2018-03-01SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2018-02-28SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/18
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-28SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-27SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-02-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-22SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-21SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-02-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/21/18, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-02-07SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2018-02-06SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/06/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-12SenateNow in Judiciary
2017-12-06SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-12-04SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 12/04/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-11-02SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-10-23SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1435 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-108
H7065 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S1514 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
H1079 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-103
H5003 (Similar To) 2018-03-20 - Chapter No. 2018-10

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100925Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39506Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395086Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409166Amended CodeSee Bill Text
414045Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback