FL S0582 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 6009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 6009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to write-in candidate residency requirements; repealing a requirement that all write-in candidates must reside within the district represented by the office sought at the time of qualification, etc.
Title
Write-in Candidate Qualifying
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Rader [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 6009 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Substituted HB 6009 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/18, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/20/18, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/13/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules |
2017-10-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6009 (Same As) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-141
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/582 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/582/BillText/Filed/HTML |