FL S0578 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a contracted vendor to release certain electronic health care records to another vendor selected by the health care provider within a specified timeframe; requiring a contract between a vendor and a health care provider to include a certain provision related to the payment of liquidated damages, etc.
Title
Electronic Health Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-10-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H183 (Similar To) 2017-12-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/578 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/578/BillText/Filed/HTML |