FL S0576 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting a limitation on industries that qualify for the research and development credit against the corporate income tax; increasing the combined total amount of credits which may be granted to business enterprises during any calendar year; requiring that a specified amount of credits be allocated to certain qualified cleantech businesses, etc.
Title
Research and Development Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Finance and Tax |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 11/12/19, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2019-10-18 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/576 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/576/BillText/Filed/HTML |