FL S0576 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Health to issue a noncertified copy of an original birth certificate to certain adoptees under certain conditions; requiring the department to maintain a birth parent's contact preference and medical history form, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoptee Birth Certificates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Health Policy
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-02SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-10-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H357 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
H77 (Similar To) 2017-08-24 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H821 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
S1250 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3820155Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback