FL S0574 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that local governments are liable for electric utility restoration costs under certain conditions; prohibiting local governments from requiring permits or other approvals for vegetation maintenance and tree pruning or trimming within an established right-of-way managed by a water management district, water control district, or special district exercising chapter 298 powers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tree and Vegetation Trimming and Removal

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-20SenateCS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2018-02-15SenateNow in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
2018-02-15SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-13SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 3 NAYS 2
2018-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/13/18, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/06/18, 11:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building --Not Considered
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-02SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Rules
2017-10-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H521 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1633209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
58937Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback