FL S0572 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Designating the "Florida High-Speed Passenger Rail Safety Act"; providing powers and duties of the Florida Department of Transportation; requiring the Florida Division of Emergency Management to offer, under certain circumstances, the local communities and local emergency services located along the rail corridor training specifically designed to help them respond to an accident involving rail passengers or hazardous materials; requiring a railroad company operating a high-speed passenger rail system to be solely responsible for certain maintenance, improvement, and upgrade costs, etc.
Title
High-speed Passenger Rail
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building --Discussed/Workshop |
2018-01-09 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-27 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-11-14 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 11/14/17, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2017-10-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H525 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
341 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 607 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 609 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 6101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 612 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 613 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 614 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |