FL S0570 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the "Youth in Solitary Confinement Reduction Act"; prohibiting the Department of Corrections or a local governmental body from subjecting youth prisoners to solitary confinement except under certain circumstances; providing for the protection of youth prisoners held in emergency cell confinement; requiring that within a specified time and at specified intervals a mental health clinician perform a face-to-face evaluation of youth prisoners who are subjected to emergency cell confinement; providing for an individualized suicide crisis intervention plan for certain youth prisoners, if applicable, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth in Solitary Confinement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30SenateDied in Health Policy
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-01-21SenateReferred to Health Policy; Criminal Justice; Appropriations
2021-01-12SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S550 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
H377 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
94409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944279Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
958155Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback