FL S0568 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definition of the term "telephonic sales call" to include voicemail transmissions; prohibiting the transmission of voicemails to specified persons who communicate to a telephone solicitor that they would not like to receive certain voicemail solicitations or requests for donations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telephone Solicitation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#619 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21 Chapter No. 2018-23
2018-03-19 Approved by Governor
2018-03-12 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-02-20SenateOrdered enrolled
2018-02-14HouseCS passed; YEAS 109 NAYS 0
2018-02-14HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-14HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-14HouseSubstituted for CS/CS/HB 315
2018-02-08HouseReceived
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
2018-02-08HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-02-01HouseIn Messages
2018-01-31SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2018-01-31SenateRead 3rd time
2018-01-24SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-24SenateOrdered engrossed
2018-01-24SenateAmendment(s) adopted (752890)
2018-01-24SenateRead 2nd time
2018-01-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/18
2018-01-16SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-11SenateCS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2018-01-11SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-11SenateCS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/11/18, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-11-17SenateNow in Rules
2017-11-14SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-11-13SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-11-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 11/13/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-11-02SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2017-10-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H315 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 568
S740 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Chapter No. 2018-84
H553 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 740

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
501059Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/568
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/568/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/568/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/568/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/568/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/568/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/568/Amendment/630160/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/568/Amendment/319690/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/568/Amendment/752890/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/568/Vote/SenateVote_s00568e1011.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/568/Vote/HouseVote_s00568e1619.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback