FL S0568 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SM 572 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SM 572 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to recognize the month of June each year as "Caribbean-American Heritage Month", etc.
Title
Caribbean-American Heritage Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SM 572 (Adopted) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0935 (Same As) 2017-04-19 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SM 572 (Adopted), HR 8015 (Adopted)
S572 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8015 (Adopted)
S572 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8015 (Adopted)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/568 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0568/BillText/Filed/HTML |