FL S0560 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting a prohibition on adult children of certain decedents recovering specified damages, etc.
Title
Recovery for Wrongful Death
Sponsors
Sen. Ana Rodriguez [R] | Sen. Jason Brodeur [R] | Sen. Keith Perry [R] | Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
Sen. Lauren Book [D] | Sen. Joe Gruters [R] | Sen. Darryl Rouson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6039 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/560 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/560/BillText/Filed/HTML |