FL S0560 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Renaming the Criminal Punishment Code as the Public Safety Code; revising the primary purpose of sentencing under the Public Safety Code from punishing an offender to public safety, etc.
Title
Sentencing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 01/22/20, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/12/19, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 568 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
910 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0027 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
924 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
924 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
958 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 465 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/560 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/560/BillText/Filed/HTML |