FL S0560 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding an exemption from public meetings requirements to allow specified entities to meet in private with attorneys and technical experts to discuss imminent litigation if certain conditions are met; requiring the transcript of a private meeting concerning imminent litigation to be made public upon the occurrence of a certain circumstance; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Meetings and Records/Imminent Litigation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied on Calendar
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-30SenateCS by Rules read 1st time
2018-01-29SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-29SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-25SenateCS by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 2
2018-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/25/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-11SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-10SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/10/18, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-11-14SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2017-11-14SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
2017-11-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 11/14/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-11-02SenateReferred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-10-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H439 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
286011Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback