FL S0560 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding an exemption from public meetings requirements to allow specified entities to meet in private with attorneys and technical experts to discuss imminent litigation if certain conditions are met; requiring the transcript of a private meeting concerning imminent litigation to be made public upon the occurrence of a certain circumstance; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Meetings and Records/Imminent Litigation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 2 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/25/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/10/18, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 1 |
2017-11-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 11/14/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H439 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee